ST AUGUSTINES PLAYGROUP
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity provides sessional childcare for pre school children aged between 2 and a half to 4 years. The playgroup provides a structured start to the childrens academic future through educational play and toys. The staff are trained/training to at least NVQ Level 2 and are supported by a parent committee team who are responsible for the financial running of the setting.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2022
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £7,250 o 6 grant(iau) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Gaerloyw
Llywodraethu
- 28 Medi 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1124222 PATA (UK)
- 23 Mai 1996: Cofrestrwyd
- 28 Medi 2022: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £113.03k | £105.84k | £110.51k | £107.00k | £100.51k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £102.71k | £104.42k | £103.77k | £110.65k | £136.95k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £91.50k | £81.90k | £96.33k | £89.31k | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £8.70k | £5.77k | £6.10k | £6.63k | £7.25k |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2022 | 27 Medi 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2022 | 27 Medi 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | 29 Ebrill 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | 29 Ebrill 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | 09 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | 09 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 16 Mehefin 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | 16 Mehefin 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 DECEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 2006 (ADOPTION OF NEW MODEL) AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 NOV 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE AIM OF THE GROUP IS TO EMBODY THE VISION OF PATA THROUGH THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENT, CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND ALSO OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY (VOLUNTARY MANAGED) GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window