Dogfen lywodraethu LONDON SPORTS FORUM FOR DISABLED PEOPLE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1993 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 APRIL 1996, 8 OCTOBER 1997, 19 JULY 2000, 11 NOVEMBER 2002 AND 18 NOVEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN GREATER LONDON THROUGH PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENABLE DISABLED PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN SPORT AND OTHER PHYSICAL RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH DISABLED PEOPLE
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.