THE SUNFLOWER TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To improve the quality of life of children aged 7 - 17 years , with learning and behavioural challenges by providing the Sunflower Programme. The Sunflower programme is a drugs free , non-evasive and holistic alternative , and is totally unique to every child to help them become healthy , and to live life with optimism and a positive outlook.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 May 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 30 Mai 1996: Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Rhagfyr 2021: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- SUNFLOWER TRUST (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £19.00k | £90.00k | £62.00k | £54.00k | £24.00k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £57.00k | £86.88k | £61.00k | £59.00k | £89.00k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2020 | 30 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2019 | 16 Mawrth 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2019 | 16 Mawrth 2020 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2018 | 27 Medi 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2018 | 27 Medi 2018 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MAY 1996
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF THOSE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND THOSE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THROUGH APPLIED KINESIOLOGY AND OTHER STANDARD METHODS OF DIAGNOSIS TO ASSESS THE MOST APPROPRIATE FORM OF TREATMENT USING, IN PARTICULAR, NATURAL THERAPIES AND TO INTRODUCE ADDITIONAL ASSESSMENT AND TREATMENT METHODS COMPLEMENTARY TO THE ABOVE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE USE OF APPLIED KINESIOLOGY IN THE ASSESSMENT AND TREATMENT OF THOSE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES. 3) TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO THE USE AND EFFECTIVENESS OF APPLIED KINESIOLOGY IN THE ASSESSMENT AND TREATMENT OF THOSE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND TO EXTEND THIS TO OTHER METHODS OF ASSESSMENT AND TREATMENT COMPLEMENTARY TO THE ABOVE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window