Dogfen lywodraethu THE ST PETER AND ST JAMES CHARITABLE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH MAY 1996. AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 OCTOBER 2001 AND 15TH SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 SEP 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 OCT 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 DEC 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.1 TO MAINTAIN ST PETER & ST JAMES HOSPICE AS A CENTRE FOR THE PROVISION OF NURSING AND PALLIATIVE CARE FOR PEOPLE WITH PROGRESSIVE LIFE-LIMITING ILLNESS, ON A NON-PROFIT MAKING BASIS, BOTH IN THE HOSPICE AND IN THE COMMUNITY; 1.2 TO ADVANCE RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN PALLIATIVE AND END OF LIFE CARE; 1.3 TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF PEOPLE FACING OR EXPERIENCING BEREAVEMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT; 1.4 IN RECOGNITION OF ITS ORIGIN AS A DONKEY CLUB, TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE AID AND SUCCOUR OF NEEDY DONKEYS ON ITS OWN PREMISES OR ELSEWHERE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE SUSSEX
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.