Dogfen lywodraethu AL-FATIHA GLOBAL
Rhif yr elusen: 1056562

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 551 diwrnod
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF FREE CLINICS FOR THE PEOPLE OF NORTHERN PAKISTAN. (II) TO PROVIDE HUMANITARIAN AID GLOBALLY IN AREAS DISRUPTED BY CONFLICT AND NATURAL DISASTER.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NORTHERN PAKISTAN
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.