Dogfen lywodraethu CBHA
Rhif yr elusen: 1056644
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 1997, 4 DECEMBER 1997, 30 APRIL 2001 AND 21 MARCH 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS IN THE AREA WITHIN A 30 MILE RADIUS OF THE ROYAL EXCHANGE IN THE CITY OF LONDON AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE PERSONS WHO WOULD QUALIFY TO BE BENEFICIARIES OF THE PEABODY TRUST PRINCIPALLY BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL RENTED HOUSING
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
AS DEFINED IN GOVERNING DOCUMENT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.