Dogfen lywodraethu ACADEMY FOR CONTEMPORARY CIRCUS AND PHYSICAL THEATRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/05/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/12/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/12/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 DEC 2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: (A) THE PROMOTION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN CIRCUS SKILLS AND PHYSICAL THEATRE; (B) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE CREATIVE AND ARTISTIC APPLICATION OF CIRCUS SKILLS AND PHYSICAL THEATRE IN ARTISTIC PERFORMANCE; AND (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS THROUGH PRODUCTION AND PERFORMANCE, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON CONTEMPORARY CIRCUS AND PHYSICAL THEATRE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.