HORSE OF THE DESERT TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We are still setting up this charity. It is for disabled and underprivaledged young people to be able to be with equines and to experience being in he countryside and to learn about horsemanship. It was originally aimed for crabbet arabian horses and the intention to breed from them. We have one stallion 100% crabbet arabian and would like to continue to breed him true to the authentic arabian.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2013
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Anifeiliaid
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 05 Awst 1996: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Mehefin 2016: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- MRS JANETTE GOLDSWORTHY (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £77 | £79 | £76 | £56 | £58 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £50 | £26 | £0 | £58 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 19 Awst 2014 | 200 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JULY 1996
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STANDARD OF THE AUTHENTIC ARAB HORSE IN PARTICULAR BY BREEDING AND REIMPORTING PURE-BRED ARAB HORSES OF THE CRABBET LINE (ONLY HORSES WHICH SATISFY THE FOLLOWING TWO CONDITIONS SHALL BE DEEMED TO BE "OF THE CRABBET LINE": (1) DIRECTLY DESCENDED IN ALL LINES FROM THE CLASS CONSISTING OF HORSES IMPORTED FROM ARABIA BY WILFRED AND LADY ANN BLUNT OF CRABBET PARK BETWEEN 1866 AND 1894 AND TWO STALLIONS IMPORTED BY THEIR DAUGHTER LADY WENTWORTH TO CRABBET PARK NAMELY DARGEE AND SCOWRONEK (2) REGISTERED IN THE GENERAL STUD BOOK PUBLISHED BY WETHERBYS) (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROMOTING AND FACILITATING THE ACQUISITION AND DISTRIBUTION OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE VARIOUS ARTS AND SCIENCES CONNECTED WITH THE USE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE ARAB HORSE (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS IN THE RIDING AND HANDLING OF ARAB HORSES (D) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO ARAB HORSES AND TO RELIEVE ARAB HORSES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF CRUELTY MALTREATMENT SICKNESS OR NEGLECT
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window