Dogfen lywodraethu YEMENI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (BIRMINGHAM)
Rhif yr elusen: 1057470

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2008. as amended on 10 Mar 2019 as amended on 02 May 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PERSONS NOW RESIDING IN BIRMINGHAM WHO WERE BORN IN THE YEMEN OR ARE DESCENDANTS OF PERSONS BORN IN THE YEMEN AND IN PARTICULAR: (A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
BIRMINGHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.