Dogfen lywodraethu KERATOCONUS SELF-HELP AND SUPPORT ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 1057629

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH MARCH 1994, AS AMENDED 23RD MAY 1996 AND, 25TH MARCH 2006 AND AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 MARCH 2008 as amended on 18 Mar 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF THOSE PERSONS, PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, SUFFERING FROM KERATOCONUS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.