Dogfen lywodraethu FAREHAM AND GOSPORT FAMILY AID
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/07/1996 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2000 AS AMENDED ON 07/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL DISTRESS, AMONG PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF MALTREATMENT BY THEIR PARTNERS OR FAMILY MEMBERS WITH WHOM THEY ARE, OR HAVE BEEN LIVING, AND BY THE PROVISION OF HOSTEL ACCOMMODATION FOR WOMEN SO AFFECTED AND THEIR CHILDREN AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.