THE SAMLING FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To promote the appreciation of operatic music To provide coaching for talented young individuals to further their skills and expertise To provide exhibitions and concert performances for the general public
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2007
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 14 Hydref 1996: Cofrestrwyd
- 04 Tachwedd 2008: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £262.88k | £248.96k | £348.18k | £378.69k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £316.10k | £166.57k | £301.31k | £207.00k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 14 Medi 2008 | 227 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 30 Medi 2008 | 243 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 30 Ionawr 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 15 Rhagfyr 2006 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2005 | 23 Ionawr 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2005 | 23 Ionawr 2006 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2004 | 10 Tachwedd 2004 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2004 | 10 Tachwedd 2004 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED 16 DECEMBER 1996
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO EDUCATE, DEVELOP, IMPROVE, ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE GENERALLY THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF SCIENCE AND MUSIC (BOTH VOCAL AND INSTRUMENTAL), THE SPOKEN AND WRITTEN WORD AND THE VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, MASTER CLASSES, RECITALS EXHIBITIONS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHARITY BY ITS TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME B) TO PROVIDE COACHING AND GENERAL FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR TALENTED YOUNG INDIVIDUALS SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEES TO FURTHER THEIR KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND EXPERTISE IN ALL MATTERS WITH MUSIC (BOTH VOCAL AND INSTRUMENTAL) THE SPOKEN AND WRITTEN WORD AND THE VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS C) TO PROVIDE FOR AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISIONS OF EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND DEMONSTRATIONS FOR MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO FURTHER AND INCREASE THEIR KNOWLEDGE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF ALL MATTERS CONNECTED WITH MUSIC (BOTH VOCAL AND INSTRUMENTAL) THE SPOKEN AND WRITTEN WORD AND THE VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window