Dogfen lywodraethu OVEREATERS ANONYMOUS GREAT BRITAIN [OAGB]

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/04/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/04/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
[1] TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM COMPULSIVE EATING [2] TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT COMPULSIVE OVEREATING AND METHODS OF RECOVERY
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.