Dogfen lywodraethu RSPCA Assured Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/06/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/12/2011 as amended on 17 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BY THE PROMOTION OF HUMANE FARMING, TRANSPORTATION, MARKETING AND SLAUGHTER OF FARM ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY IMPLEMENTING A SET OF REARING AND HANDLING STANDARDS APPROVED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ("THE RSPCA"). 2) TO OTHERWISE PREVENT, SUPPRESS OR ALLEVIATE CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, WHETHER WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.