Dogfen lywodraethu THE COLLEGE OF OPTOMETRISTS

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
ROYAL CHARTER 28 JUNE 1995, AS UPDATED BY TWO ORDERS OF THE PRIVY COUNCIL DATED 10 JUNE 2004 , ONE ORDER OF THE PRIVY COUNCIL DATED 19 JULY 2005, AND ONE ORDER OF THE PRIVY COUNCIL DATED 29 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 20 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 09 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 22 MAY 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE (1) THE IMPROVEMENT AND CONSERVATION OF HUMAN VISION (2) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE STUDY OF, AND RESEARCH INTO, OPTOMETRY, OPHTHALMIC OPTICS AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS THEREOF (3) THE PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF OPTOMENTRY, OPHTHALMIC OPTICS AND RELATED SUBJECTS (4) THE MAINTENANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL COMPETENCE AND CONDUCT ON THE PART OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.