Dogfen lywodraethu AGE CONCERN BROMLEY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 20 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 28 NOVEMBER 2001 AND 17 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED ON 29 NOV 2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 JAN 2012 as amended on 03 Dec 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF BROMLEY AND GREENWICH (HEREINAFTER CALLED “THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) B) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF ADULTS IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGHS OF BROMLEY AND GREENWICH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.