Y Gofrestr Elusennau - Y Comisiwn Elusennau ST ROSES CONVENT, STROUD
Rhif yr elusen: 228848-2
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
DEEDS OF 10TH JUNE 1915, 22ND JULY 1921, 1ST SEPT., 1923, SCHEME OF 29TH JULY 1945 AND FURTHER DEEDSOF 10TH MARCH 1945 AND 6TH DECEMBER 1950.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
RELIGIOUS CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE CONGREGATION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Hanes cofrestru
- 22 Awst 1963: Cofrestrwyd
- 02 Medi 1992: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.