Trosolwg o'r elusen RICHARD RAGGETT
Rhif yr elusen: 238310-5
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
SCHEME OF 4 JUNE 1886 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 11 MARCH 1904, 27 APRIL 1923, 20 SEPTEMBER 1946 AND 8 JUNE 1951
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ALMSHOUSES FOR THE POOR
Maes buddion
ANCIENT PARISH OF ODIHAM
Hanes cofrestru
- 25 Tachwedd 1964: Cofrestrwyd
- 04 Ebrill 1996: Tynnwyd
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.