Dogfen lywodraethu AGE CONCERN (MERTON)
Rhif yr elusen: 200436
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION DATED 21 FEBRUARY 1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 10TH JUNE 1975, 22ND SEPTEMBER 1980 AND 20TH SEPTEMBER 1982 AND 30TH JULY 1990
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE MITCHAM AND COLLIERS WOOD AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.