THE ROYAL NAVAL AND ROYAL MARINE MATERNITY HOME AND CHILD WELFARE CENTRE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Nid oes gwybodaeth ar gael am weithgareddau'r elusen.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
Llywodraethu
- 10 Ebrill 1962: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Gorffennaf 1994: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14.3.1923; CONVEYANCE DATED 10.9.1932; SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 12.2.1952 AND A SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS 25.10.1957.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE A MATERNITY HOME AND CHILD WELFARE CENTRE FOR A LIMITED NUMBER OF WIVES OF OFFICERS AND OF THE WIVES OF MEN OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND ROYAL MARINES BELOW THE RANK OF COMMISSIONED OFFICER. (SEE SCHEME DATED 25TH OCTOBER,1957).
Maes buddion
COUNTY BOROUGH OF PORTSMOUTH, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.