Dogfen lywodraethu THE UNITED CHARITIES

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF 22 JULY 1910 AND VARYING SCHEMES OF 24 FEBRUARY 1939, 29 AUGUST 1953, 5 OCTOBER 1961 AND NOTICE UNDER CHARITIES ACT 1985 DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1990.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BLEWBURY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF BLEWBURY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.