Dogfen lywodraethu CHIPPING CAMPDEN TOWN TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEMES OF THE 2ND AUGUST 1899, 29TH MAY 1931, 4TH SEPTEMBER 1951 AND 8TH DECEMBER 1959 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 2 JULY 1996
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEE SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (1) IN DEFRAYING ALL PROPER COSTS, CHARGES AND EXPENSES OF AND INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OFTHE CHARITY; (2) IN INSURING AS AFORESAID AND IN MAINTAINING AND REPAIRING THE TOWN HALL AND OTHER PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY INCLUDING THE FURNITURE AND EFFECTS THEREIN AND IN PAYING ALL OTHER CHARGES AND OUTGOINGS; (3) IN MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE EXTRAORDINARY REPAIR FUND AS HEREINAFTER PROVIDED. (SEE SCHEME FOR FURTHER DETAILS.)
Maes buddion
CHIPPING CAMPDEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.