Dogfen lywodraethu HAWLEY ALMSHOUSE AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEMES OF 21ST DECEMBER 1970, 4TH AUGUST 1972 AND 5 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 28 NOVEMBER 2006. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/03/2016 AS AMENDED ON 15 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 MAR 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ALMSPEOPLE SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO (EXCEPT IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES TO BE APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA COVERED BY HART DISTRICT COUNCIL AND RUSHMOOR BOROUGH COUNCIL AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT. 2. SUBJECT TO PAYMENT OF THE EXPENSES THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY OF THE RELIEF IN NEED BRANCH IN RELEIVING EITHER GENERALLY OF INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA COVERED BY HART DISTRICT COUNCIL AND RUSHMOOR BOROUGH COUNCIL WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSON
Maes buddion
HAWLEY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.