Dogfen lywodraethu CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 204757
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES AND REGULATION OF THE SOCIETY ESTABLISHED MARCH 1846 AS AMENDED 16TH NOVEMBER AND 21ST JULY 1981 AND 16TH MAY 1990 AND 21 MAY 1996, 15 OCTOBER 2002 AND 16 MAY 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE A HOME FOR AGED AND INFIRM PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENTS OF, OR WHO HAVE CLOSE ASSOCIATIONS WITH, THE CITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.