Dogfen lywodraethu BERKSHIRE NURSES AND RELIEF IN SICKNESS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 25 APRIL 1980, UPDATED BY SCHEME SEALED 8 SEPT 1997, AMENDED 6 JULY 1998
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE INCOME AND AT THE TRUSTEES DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: 1) FOR RELIEF IN SICKNESS. 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE FOLLOWING PERSONS WHO THROUGH AGE, ILL HEALTH, ACCIDENT OR INFIRMITY ARE UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES. 2) (A) NURSES OR MIDWIVES WHO WERE EMPLOYED AS DISTRICT NURSES IN THE AREA OF THE ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE AS CONSTITUTED IMMEDIATELY PRIOR TO 1 APRIL 1974 BEFORE THE DATE OF THE COMING INTO OPERATION OF THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE ACT 1946, AND HAVE BEFORE OR SINCE THE LAST MENTIONED DATE CEASED TO BE EMPLOYED IN HOME NURSING IN THE SAID AREA, AND (B) PERSONS EMPLOYED AT ANY TIME BEFORE THE 4 AUGUST 1950 ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE OR CLERICAL STAFF OF THE BERKSHIRE COUNTY NURSING ASSOCIATION.
Maes buddion
THE ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE TOGETHER WITH THOSE AREAS IN THE COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE WHICH IMMEDIATELY PRIOR TO 1 APRIL 1974 COMPRISED PART OF THE ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.