Trosolwg o'r elusen WILLIAM SUTTON TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 205847
Elusen a dynnwyd
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
On 1st April 2004 the Trust transferred all its assets and liabilities to William Sutton Housing Association Limited, now the amalgamated Affinity Sutton Homes from 30 September 2011. The Trust did not carry out any activity in the year ended 31st March 2013 and does not expect to trade in future periods. The Trust was de-registered from the Tenant Services Authority register on 17 September 2010.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2016
Cyfanswm incwm: £0
Cyfanswm gwariant: £0
Codi arian
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Masnachu
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.