Dogfen lywodraethu WILLIAM SUTTON TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE 15TH MAY 1990, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 13 MARCH 1997, AND RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 OCTOBER 1997, 23 JULY 1998 & 28 NOVEMBER 2002.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH LOW INCOME RESIDENT IN ENGLAND, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND HOSTELS WITH ANCILLARY AMENITIES THERETO UPON SUCH TERMS AS ARE APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS AND THE RELIEF OF POOR PERSONS ACCOMMODATED WITHIN THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.