Dogfen lywodraethu THE SHEPPARD TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 205924
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF 11 OCTOBER 1932 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 15 FEBRUARY 1961, 28 SEPTEMBER 1965, 22 JANUARY 1971 AND 21 DECEMBER 1983.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND SUCH ATTENDANCE AS MAY BE NECESSARY FOR LADIES OF GENTLE BIRTH IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.