Dogfen lywodraethu THE HARLEY CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JANUARY 1841 (UV 4 P 495 AND UV 162 P24) AND SCHEMES DATED 23 FEBRUARY 1973 AND 30TH OCTOBER 1978 TOGETHER WITH RESOLUTIONS DATED 20 AUGUST 2009 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 28 AUGUST 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONG CHURCH OF ENGLAND CLERGY AND THEIR WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE DIOCESE OF HEREFORD B) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF PHYSICAL INCAPACITY INCLUDING BLIND PERSONS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE DIOCESE OF HEREFORD C) THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE, UPKEEP, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF HEREFORD CATHEDRAL AND OTHER CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHURCHES IN THE DIOCESE OF HEREFORD D) WHERE FUNDS ARE AVAILABLE, TO SUPPORT BY WAY WAY OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES, MOST PARTICULARLY THOSE OPERATING IN THE HEREFORDSHIRE AREA.
Maes buddion
1. NOT DEFINED 2. HEREFORD RADNOR BRECON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.