Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF ACCIDENTS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 22ND JUNE 1928 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF THE 17TH MAY 1951, 17TH APRIL 1964, 22ND OCTOBER 1965, 17TH NOVEMBER 1972, 8TH DECEMBER 1994, 21 OCTOBER 2005, AND 9 NOVEMBER 2007 as amended on 13 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, IN ANY PLACE AND IN THE COURSE OF ANY ACTIVITY INCLUDING BY RESEARCHING, EDUCATING AND INFORMING, DEVISING AND ADVANCING PRINCIPLES AND METHODS FOR THE PREVENTION OF AND PROTECTION AGAINST ACCIDENTS OF ALL KINDS
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.