Dogfen lywodraethu 2 CARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/09/1929 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/01/2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04/03/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS, OLD AGE AND DISTRESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.