THE CHURCH OF SCOTLAND LONDON ADVISORY SERVICE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Borderline supports homeless and insecurely housed Scots in London. We help people find accommodation in London and specialise in resettling clients in Scotland. Borderline helps clients obtain birth certificates, helps find hostel rooms, and can access referrals to alcohol, drug and mental health services. We aim to help every client find secure, long-term accommodation.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2008
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Llety/tai
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 22 Medi 1964: Cofrestrwyd
- 17 Ionawr 2011: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- BORDERLINE (Enw gwaith)
- COSLAS (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £186.18k | £169.22k | £160.37k | £237.61k | £225.90k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £277.90k | £240.18k | £254.17k | £262.22k | £266.20k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2009 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 22 Ebrill 2010 | 81 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 12 Ionawr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 12 Ionawr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 12 Rhagfyr 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 01 Tachwedd 2007 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 12 Ionawr 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 17 Ionawr 2007 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND OCTOBER 1950 AND SCHEME OF 24TH MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED 8TH JANUARY 1992
Gwrthrychau elusennol
INCOME TO BE APPLIED AMONG YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN WHO ARE RESIDENT, WORKING, OR PURSUING EDUCATION OF TRAINING AT EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN GREATER LONDON WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE BORN OR EDUCATED IN SCOTLAND OR ARE OTHERWISE OF SCOTTISH ORIGIN IN EITHER OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED: (B) IN HELPING AND EDUCATING SUCH YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, MORAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, SO THAT THEY MEY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window