Dogfen lywodraethu THE HACKNEY HORSE SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/01/1884 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. TO IMPROVE THE BREED AND TO PROMOTE THE BREEDING OF HACKNEY HORSES AND PONIES. B. TO COMPILE AND PUBLISH A STUD BOOK OF SUCH HORSES. C. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE SOCIETY AND SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS CONTAINED IN THE 21ST SECTION OF THE COMPANIES ACT 1862, TO PURCHASE, TAKE ON LEASE, HIRE AND OTHERWISE ACQUIRE FOR THE SOCIETY, HOUSES, LANDS, GOODS, CHATTELS AND EFFECTS AND TO SELL, LET AND OTHERWISE DISPOSE OF THE SAME. D. TO HOLD SHOWS OF SUCH HORSES, TO OFFER PRIZES AND TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS MAY BE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.