Dogfen lywodraethu J E JOSEPH CHARITABLE FUND
Rhif yr elusen: 209058

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
WILL AND CODICIL PROVED ON 29 AUGUST 1946 AND SCHEMES OF 16 JULY 1956, 17 APRIL 1961, 24 OCTOBER 1972 AND 11 MAY 1977. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 MAR 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITIES NAMELY:- A) RELIEF OF POVERTY. B) RELIEF OF AFFLICTIONS OR SUFFERING OF POOR JEWS. C) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. D) ADVANCEMENT OF JEWISH RELIGION. E) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE JEWISH COMMUNITIES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.