Dogfen lywodraethu ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL FOR THE CLERGY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 18TH MAY 1918. CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 4TH MAY 1949, 17TH MAY 1977, 15TH MAY 1981, 18 SEPT 2007, AND 18 JUNE 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE MEDICAL AND SURGICAL TREATMENT AND A HOSPITAL FOR ANGLICAN (A) CLERGY OF THE COMMUNION AND OF THOSE CHURCHES IN FULL COMMUNION WITH IT, THEIR SPOUSES, WIDOWS, DEPENDANT CHILDREN AND OTHER RELATIVES AS APPROVED BY THE EXECUTIVE OR HOUSE COMMITTEE. (B) THEOLOGICAL STUDENTS WHO HAVE BEEN ACCEPTED AS CANDIDATES FOR HOLY ORDERS BY A BISHOP OF THE COMMUNION. (C) ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE ORDER OF DEACONESSES. (D) MISSIONARIES. (E) WHOLE TIME LAY CHURCH WORKERS LICENSED BY A BISHOP. (F) MEMBERS OF RECOGNISED MONASTIC AND CONVENTIONAL ORDERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.