Dogfen lywodraethu BRIGHTON SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
Rhif yr elusen: 209698
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 27 JANUARY 1940 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1950, 01 JUNE 1951 25 JUNE 1957, 01 NOVEMBER 1973 AND 12 OCTOBER 1977 4TH JULY 1990 22ND MARCH 1994 14TH OCTOBER 1999
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED, AND DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE BRIGHTON, HOVE, AND OTHER AREAS OF SUSSEX IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS OR SHALL HEREAFTER BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE IN LAW
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
BRIGHTON & HOVE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.