Dogfen lywodraethu THE BOARD OF GUARDIANS AND TRUSTEES FOR THE RELIEF OF THE JEWISH POOR REGISTERED (COMMONLY CALLED THE JEWISH WELFARE BOARD)
Rhif yr elusen: 209723
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
LAWS OF THE BOARD ADOPTED ON 29 MARCH 1967 CONFIRMED 5 APRIL 1967 AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1967, 18 MARCH 1992 AND SCHEME OF 14 DECEMBER 1989
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND TO AMELIORATE THE CONDITION OF THE JEWISH POOR OF THE METROPOLIS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.