Dogfen lywodraethu THE CREMATION SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH JULY 1922 AS AMENDED 2ND APRIL 1930, 29TH MARCH 1974, 1ST DECEMBER 1977, 14 OCTOBER 2004 AND 17TH JUNE 2008 as amended on 29 Oct 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE THE PRACTICE OF CREMATION FOR THE RESPECTFUL DISPOSAL OF THE BODIES OF DEAD PERSONS AND 2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE PRACTICE AND ETHICS OF CREMATION 3. TO INVESTIGATE METHODS OF DISPOSING OF THE BODIES OF DEAD PERSONS WHICH APPEAR TO THE SOCIETY TO BE SUPERIOR TO CREMATION AND, IF THE SOCIETY THINKS FIT, TO PROMOTE SUCH METHODS AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THEIR PRACTICE AND ETHICS EITHER INSTEAD OF OR IN ADDITION TO CREMATION
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.