Dogfen lywodraethu THE CATHOLIC CHILDREN'S SOCIETY (WESTMINSTER)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/1905 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/08/1984 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/12/2015 as amended on 11 Aug 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS SHALL SEEM FIT THE MATERIAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS, ADULTS WHO WERE BENEFICIARIES OF THE SOCIETY AS CHILDREN OR YOUNG PERSONS, ADULTS WHO WERE (OR WHO HAVE FAMILY MEMBERS WHO WERE) IN FOSTER, ADOPTIVE OR RESIDENTIAL CARE AS CHILDREN OR YOUNG PERSONS, AND FAMILIES WITH CHILDREN AND/OR YOUNG PERSONS IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF WESTMINSTER AND ELSEWHERE AND WHETHER OR NOT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FOR SUCH PERSONS ACCOMMODATION (WHETHER IN PROPERTY BELONGING TO THE SOCIETY OR OTHERWISE AND WHETHER OR NOT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM) AND ALSO CLOTHING, EDUCATION AND TRAINING, ADVICE AND COUNSELLING.
Maes buddion
THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF WESTMINSTER AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.