Dogfen lywodraethu SOUTH EASTERN ELECTRICITY INDUSTRIAL STAFF BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 210994
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES OF SOCIETY DATED MAY 1957 AND AMENDED 18TH MARCH 1959, 11TH MARCH 1960, 30TH NOVEMBER 1960, 24TH MARCH 1961 AND 27TH APRIL 1977
Gwrthrychau elusennol
GRANTING RELIEF IN CASE OF NECESSITY IN MONEY OR KIND:- 1. TO OR FOR PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY AND IN RESPECT OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY, 2. PERSONS WHO ALTHOUGH NOT MEMBERS OR PAST MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY ARE OR WERE ELIGIBLE FOR MEMBERSHIP.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
KENT,SUSSEX,SURREY AND PART OF GREATER LONDON AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.