Dogfen lywodraethu ROBERT KITCHIN (SADDLERS' CO)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEMES DATED 9 MAY 1891, 5 JANUARY 1972, 13 MAY 1987, 26 APRIL 1993, AND 24 OCTOBER 2005.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
50% TO THE CITY UNIVERSITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECT OF THE SAID UNIVERSITY. 15% TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE ST. ETHELBURGA'S CENTRE FOR RECONCILIATION AND PEACE (1064850) TO BE APPLIED BY THEM FOR THE PURPOSES OF THAT CHARITY INCLUDING THE COST OF THE UPKEEP, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, INSURANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC AND CONTENTS OF THE CHURCH BUILDING OF ST. ETHELBURGA, BISHOPSGATE IN THE CITY OF LONDON AND ITS GARDEN AND APPURTENANCES AND IN MEETING THE COST OF THE WORK UNDERTAKEN AT THE ST. ETHELBURGA'S CENTRE. THE REMAINING 35% THEREOF SHALL BE APPLIED AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COMPANY.
Maes buddion
CITY OF LONDON.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.