Dogfen lywodraethu HORTICULTURE RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL
Rhif yr elusen: 211581
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 24 JANUARY 1921 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1987, 30 MARCH 1990, 19 SEPTEMBER 1990, 26 JUNE 1991, 14 JULY 1993 AND 31 MARCH 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO CARRY ON RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT WORK AND TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE IN CONNECTION WITH HORTICULTURE AND KINDRED INDUSTRIES INCLUDING FOREST TREES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.