Dogfen lywodraethu PEAK AND NORTHERN FOOTPATHS SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION OF RULES, AS AMENDED 26/04/1984, 23/04/1987, 16/04/1991, 15/04/1993, 06/04/1995, 27 /04/2002 , 26/04/2003 AND 27/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 14 APR 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
CREATING, PRESERVING AND IMPROVING OPEN SPACES, PUBLIC ACCESS RIGHTS AND RIGHTS OF WAY (OTHER THAN FOR MECHANICALLY PROPELLED VEHICLES); PARTICULARLY IN CHESHIRE, DERBYSHIRE, LANCASHIRE AND STAFFORDSHIRE, THE FORMER METROPOLITAN COUNTIES OF GREATER MANCHESTER, MERSEYSIDE, SOUTH AND WEST YORKSHIRE AND IN BLACKBURN & DARWEN, BLACKPOOL, DERBY, HALTON, STOKE-ON-TRENT AND WARRINGTON. B) PREVENTING THE ABUSE OF SUCH RIGHTS. C) MONITORING, SUPPORTING AND OPPOSING PROPOSALS AND ORDERS FOR THE CREATION, CLOSURE, DIVERSION AND REGRADING OF PUBLIC RIGHTS OF WAY. D) ERECTING AND MAINTAINING DIRECTION POSTS, SIGNS, FOOTBRIDGES AND COMMEMORATIVE AND OTHER STRUCTURES WHICH IMPROVE ACCESS. E) ALL OBJECTS CONDUCIVE TO THE FOREGOING.
Maes buddion
SEE ABOVE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.