Dogfen lywodraethu DERBYSHIRE SPECIAL CONSTABULARY BENEVOLENT FUND

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 13 MAY 1945 AS AMENDED ON 01 NOV 1967 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAY 1970 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 1974 AS AMENDED ON 01 NOV 1975 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAY 1977 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 1984 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 1992 AS AMENDED ON 13 NOV 1994 AS AMENDED ON 27 SEP 2000 AS AMENDED ON 06 APR 2009 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUN 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1)TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES:- (A) ANY SERVING MEMBER OF THE DERBYSHIRE SPECIAL CONSTABULARY (B) ANY FORMER MEMBER OF DERBYSHIRE SPECIAL CONSTABULARY (C) DEPENDANTS ON THE DEATH OF A MEMBER. (2) TO MAKE GRANTS TO ANY OTHER CHARITABLE CAUSE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE.
Maes buddion
DERBYSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.