Dogfen lywodraethu BRUNTS CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 8 JULY 1958 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 21 JUNE 1963 AND 10 AUGUST 1972, 3 MARCH 1977, 11 MAY 1977, 13 JUNE 1977 23 JUNE 1977 AND 4 NOVEMBER 1983. AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14TH MAY 2003.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. ú1 PA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CONGREGATION DESCRIBED IN THE WILL OF SAMUEL BRUNT'S AS JOHN FLETCHER'S CONGREGATION. 2. ú1,000 PA TO THE GOVERNORS OF BRUNTS GRAMMAR SCHOOL. 3. ADDITIONAL PAYMENTS NOT EXCEEDING ú1,000 PA TO THE SAID GOVERNORS AS THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS APPROVE. 4. GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR (FOR MEANS OF APPLICATION SEE SCHEME DATED 8 JULY 1958).
Maes buddion
FORMER BOROUGH OF MANSFIELD.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.