Dogfen lywodraethu YMCA LEICESTERSHIRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES 24 SEP 1919 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAY 1948 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 APR 1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 APR 1957 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 OCT 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 OCT 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 SEP 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE: I) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE OCCUPATION FOR YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE II) TO PROVIDE, IMPROVE AND MANAGE ACCOMMODATION PROVIDING RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES FOR YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN IN HOUSING NEED. III) TO ADVANCE LIFE FOR YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; IV) TO PROVIDE, MANAGE AND DELIVER RESIDENTIAL CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN, PROVIDING THEM WITH A SAFE AND CARING FOUNDATION FOR THEIR FUTURE DEVELOPMENT. V) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COACHING, EDUCATION, EMPOWERMENT AND ARTISTIC EXPERIENCES.
Maes buddion
CITY OF LEICESTER OR ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.