Dogfen lywodraethu HYELM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/12/1929 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/05/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE BENEVOLENT OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF PROVIDING A GOOD STANDARD OF SOCIAL HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THE ORDINARY CHARGES OF PRIVATE MARKET HOUSING PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE YOUNG PEOPLE WHO LIVE IN, OR WISH TO MOVE TO, LONDON; 3.2 TO CARRY OUT ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A REGISTERED PROVIDER REGISTERED AS SUCH WITH THE REGULATOR; 3.3 ANY OTHER PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH OR INCIDENTAL TO THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF SOCIAL HOUSING; AND 3.4 ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE FROM TIME TO TIME NOT PROHIBITED ACTIVITIES UNDER THE HOUSING AND REGENERATION ACT 2008 FOR A COMPANY REGISTERED AS A PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WITH THE REGULATOR.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.