Dogfen lywodraethu THE LUCIS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/10/1935 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/12/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS SHALL ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEARNING IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELDS OF COMPARATIVE RELIGION, PHILOSPHY, SCIENCE AND ART. (II) SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS SHALL RELIEVE HUMAN SUFFERING AND PROMOTE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENT IN THE HUMAN RACE. (III) SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS SHALL ON A NON-SECTARIAN BASIS PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.