Dogfen lywodraethu WEST MOORS MEMORIAL HALL
Rhif yr elusen: 217171

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1 JUNE 1929 WITH THE CHARITABLE TRUSTS VALIDATION ACT 1954 APPLIED AND TRUST DEED DATED 27 JUNE 1929 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 JANUARY 2022; 7 MARCH 2022; AND 6 NOVEMBER 2023 as amended on 05 May 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF WEST MOORS AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
WEST MOORS AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.