Dogfen lywodraethu MUSTER ROLL TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 MARCH 1987, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 JANUARY 1990, 18 SEPTEMBER 2001, ORDER DATED 31 JULY 2002, SCHEME DATED 16 DECEMBER 2005.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES, TO PROVIDE ACCOMODATION FOR MERCHANT SEAMEN OF THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS OR THE DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MERCHANT SEAMEN BEING IN ANY CASE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 2) THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY INCOME FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY MERCHANT SEAMEN OR THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS OR THE DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MERCHANT SEAMEN BEING IN ANY CASE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY O PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVIES, OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF BOSTON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.